VA HB546 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Summary
Multiline telephone systems. Provides that an alternative method of providing call location information exists when a 9-1-1 call to a public safety answering point (PSAP) provides sufficient information to ensure that emergency responders are dispatched to a location at the facility from which the call was placed, where the responders are able to view all of the telephone stations in the contiguous area containing the telephone from which the emergency call was placed. Currently, an alternative method requires responders to be able to view all of the telephone stations at the facility. MLTS providers of a system using VOIP services acquired or installed on or after July 1, 2009, shall make reasonable efforts to ensure that emergency calls provide calling party information to the 9-1-1 network or an alternative method of providing call location information. The measure also provides that the MLTS provider of a multiline telephone system acquired or installed on or after July 1, 2009, is required, if reasonably achievable, to be able to provide calling party information to the 9-1-1 network that connects to the PSAP, or to provide an alternative method of providing call location information. Calling party information allows equipment at the PSAP to perform automatic location identification (ALI) and automatic number identification (ANI). MLTS providers are required to arrange to update the ALI database with the appropriate master street address guide, valid address and callback information corresponding to the calling party information for each telephone station, and to update the information as soon as practicable for new MLTS installation or within one business day of record completion of the actual changes for previously installed systems. Currently, such providers are required to ensure that emergency calls provide either ALI and ANI or an alternative method of providing call location information.
Title
Telephone systems, multiline; alternative method of providing emergency calls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB546ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB546ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-04 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB546H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080164656-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 080164656-H1 | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080041656 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB546 |