VA HB543 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of General Services; lease of surplus property. Permits the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to allow charitable organizations exempt from taxation under ?§501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code that provide addiction recovery services to lease or sublease at cost and on such terms as approved by the Governor surplus property or space within a building owned by the Commonwealth or any space leased by the Commonwealth in excess of current and reasonably anticipated needs, provided such use is deemed appropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Services, Department of; lease or sublease of surplus property to charitable organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB543ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB543ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 18101049D-E
2018-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB543E
2018-02-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-05HouseRead second time
2018-02-02HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-01HouseRead first time
2018-01-30HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101049D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221156(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB543
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB543+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB543E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB543ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB543ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0825+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0004+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0031+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0346+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0168+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB0543+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB0543+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1641+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0543+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0543+HB0543
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0543+HB0543

Bill Comments

feedback