VA HB538 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
Summary
Commercial dog breeding operations; penalty. Defines a commercial breeder as any person who, during any 12-month period, maintains 30 or more adult female dogs for the primary purpose of the sale of their offspring as companion animals. Commercial breeders will be required to: (i) apply for a business license from their respective locality; (ii) cooperate with inspections by animal control officers to ensure compliance with state and federal animal care laws; (iii) maintain records of animal sales, purchases, breeding history, and veterinary care; (iv) dispose of dead dogs and confined waste in accordance with law; and (v) maintain no more than 50 dogs over the age of one year at one time for breeding purposes. The bill also provides that any person who has been convicted of any law concerning abuse, neglect, or cruelty to animals may not sell or trade any companion animal. Commercial breeders that violate any of these provisions are guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Pet shops must ensure that their dogs are purchased from dealers or persons that are properly registered and licensed with the U.S. Department of Agriculture. This bill incorporates
Title
Commercial dog breeders; definition, requirements, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 852 (effective 1/1/09) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB538ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (66-Y 29-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation #4 (66-Y 29-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (87-Y 9-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendations #1,2,3 & 5 (87-Y 9-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB538ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 31-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (68-Y 31-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083282672-S1 (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (34-Y 5-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB538S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Colgan agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Colgan withdrawn | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083282672-S1 | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083282672-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-13 | House: Substitute bill reprinted 081215672-H2 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB538H2 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 081215672-H2 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute from ACNR rejected 083268672-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081215672-H2 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 083268672-H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 9-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083233672 |
Same As/Similar To
HB690 (Similar To) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB538 |