VA HB537 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Summary
Rabies vaccination certificates; public access; duties of local treasurers. Exempts records sent by veterinarians to local treasurers from public access under the Freedom of Information Act when such information is not contained in the animal license or license application. This will allow local treasurers to dispose of records sent from veterinarians. This bill incorporates
Title
Rabies vaccination certificates; exempts certain records sent to local treasurer from public access.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016) | |
2008-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB537ER) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB537H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083267672-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 083267672-H1 | |
2008-01-23 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083222672 |
Same As/Similar To
HB457 (Similar To) 2008-01-23 - House: Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (HB537-Orrock) by voice vote
Subjects
Administration of Government
Agriculture, Horticulture and Food
Professions and Occupations
Records Retention
Agriculture, Horticulture and Food
Professions and Occupations
Records Retention
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB537 |