VA HB533 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural gas utilities; cost recovery for certain infrastructure improvement costs. Authorizes investor-owned natural gas utilities to petition the State Corporation Commission to implement a separate rider that will allow for recovery of certain costs associated with eligible infrastructure replacement projects. Eligible infrastructure replacement projects are projects that: (i) enhance safety or reliability by reducing system integrity risks associated with customer outages, corrosion, equipment failures, material failures, natural forces, or other outside force damage; (ii) do not increase revenues by directly connecting the infrastructure replacement to new customers; (iii) reduce greenhouse gas emissions; (iv) are not included in the natural gas utility's rate base in its most recent rate case; and (v) are commenced on or after January 1, 2010. The costs recoverable from an eligible infrastructure replacement project include a return on the investment, a revenue conversion factor, depreciation, property taxes, and carrying costs on the over- or under- recovery of the eligible infrastructure replacement costs. A SAVE plan shall be allocated and charged so as to avoid undue cross-subsidization between rate classes.
Title
Steps to Advance Virginia's Energy Plan (SAVE) Act; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB533ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105452D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB533S1 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105452D-S1 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105452D-S1 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103775D |