VA HB52 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Competency and sanity evaluations; location of evaluation. Requires that evaluations to determine whether a person is competent to stand trial or to determine a person's sanity at the time of the commission of a criminal offense be conducted on an outpatient basis at a mental health facility or in jail unless an outpatient evaluation has been conducted and the outpatient evaluator opines that a hospital-based evaluation is needed to reliably reach an opinion or unless the defendant is in the custody of the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Currently, such evaluations are to be conducted on an outpatient basis, but a court may order that a person be hospitalized instead if the court finds the services necessary to conduct an outpatient evaluation are not available or if the results of the outpatient evaluation indicate that it is necessary to hospitalize the person for further evaluation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competency and sanity evaluations; location of evaluation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB52ER)
2018-02-27HouseEnrolled
2018-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-23HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-21SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-21SenateRead third time
2018-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-08HousePrinted as engrossed 18100445D-E
2018-02-08HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB52E
2018-02-08HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-08HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100445D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192169.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192169.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB52
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB52+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB52E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB52ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0367+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0045+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0093+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0500+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0341+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0576HB0052+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0588HB0052+HB0052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1017+HB0052

Bill Comments

feedback