VA HB515 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Rights of parents with a disability. Provides that a parent's disability, as defined in the bill, shall not be the sole basis of the denial or restriction of such parent's custody or visitation rights. The bill requires a party who alleges that a parent's disability should be a factor to be considered to not be in the best interests of the child, or should otherwise be a reason to deny or restrict such a parent's custody or visitation rights, to prove that the child's best interests would not be met or served due to such parent's disability. The bill allows a parent with a disability to demonstrate how supportive parenting services would appropriately address any threats to the child's best interests and further allows the court to order that such services be ordered by the court. The bill requires a court to make written findings where the court denies or restricts custody or visitation of a parent with a disability or where supportive parenting services are not ordered. The same requirements apply to the denial or approval of a prospective foster parent with a disability, or removal of a child from the home of a foster parent with a disability, and to the denial of a final order of adoption wherein the prospective adoptive parent has a disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody and visitation; rights of parents with a disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101114D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321200.01(n/a)See Bill Text
632901.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback