VA HB511 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric vehicle charging stations; operation by state agencies. Authorizes any agency of state government to locate and operate a retail fee-based electric vehicle charging station on property the agency controls. The bill exempts state agencies from being considered a public utility solely because of the sale of electric vehicle charging service or the ownership or operation of an electric vehicle charging station and further exempts such service from constituting the retail sale of electricity. Currently, state-operated charging stations may be operated by the Department of Conservation and Recreation, Department of General Services, Department of Motor Vehicles, Department of Transportation, and public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric vehicle charging stations; operation by state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Obenshain rejected (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
2020-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 490 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB511ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-02-25SenateAmendments by Senator Obenshain rejected (18-Y 21-N)
2020-02-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 31-N)
2020-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 31-N)
2020-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 20100946D-E
2020-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB511E
2020-01-28HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-28HouseRead second time
2020-01-27HouseRead first time
2020-01-23HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100946D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101104.01(n/a)See Bill Text
22614.5(n/a)See Bill Text
2311301.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2312908.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB511&201+sum+HB511
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB511+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB511E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB511ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0490+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1903V0005+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0028+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0044+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0174+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0210+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0962HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0964HB0511+HB0511

Bill Comments

feedback