VA HB511 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse or neglect; sex offenders; investigations; reports to local attorney for the Commonwealth. Requires local departments of social services to notify the local attorney for the Commonwealth of all complaints of suspected child abuse or neglect involving the child’s being left alone in the same dwelling with a person to whom the child is not related by blood or marriage and who has been convicted of an offense against a minor for which registration is required as a violent sexual offender. The bill also adds such a complaint to the list of complaints that a local department that has been designated as a child-protective services differential response agency by the Department of Social Services must investigate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse or neglect; sex offenders, investigations, reports to law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB511ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB511ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-21SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2018-02-21SenateRead third time
2018-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 10-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100374D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321503(n/a)See Bill Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB511
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB511+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB511ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB511ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0823+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1202V0039+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0092+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0552+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0066+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0589HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1639+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0511+HB0511
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0511+HB0511

Bill Comments

feedback