VA HB51 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred disposition in a criminal case. Provides that except as otherwise provided in law, a trial court presiding in a criminal case shall, unless all parties agree to a waiver of the requirement, announce a judgment of, or enter an order of, conviction or acquittal within 72 hours of the conclusion of the guilt phase of the trial. The bill also provides that if circumstances requiring delay exist, the court may, upon notice to the parties, delay announcement of the verdict or entry of the order for 21 additional days.
Title
Deferred disposition; trial court shall announce judgment within 72 hours of guilt phase of trial.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB750-Cline) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-30 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB750-Cline) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-12-19 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-19 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100392D |
Same As/Similar To
HB750 (Similar To) 2012-03-02 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N)