VA HB5089 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supplement to the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. Expands the Supplement to the Sex Offender and Crimes against Minors Registry to include information on persons who were convicted of certain sexual offenses on or after July 1, 1970, and before July 1, 1994, who are not currently on the Registry. The Supplement currently includes information on such persons who were convicted on or after July 1, 1980, and before July 1, 1994.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; expands the Supplement to the Registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-08-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-08-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200557D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5089 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5089+hil |