VA HB5068 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5068ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency relief payments exempt from creditor process; emergency. Automatically exempts from the creditor process emergency relief payments, as defined in the bill, paid to individuals. The bill further requires a financial institution receiving such payments directly from the federal government to exempt such payments from the creditor process under certain circumstances. The bill provides that, if a financial institution does not set aside such payments as exempt, the accountholder receiving such payments must claim the exemption. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency relief payments; automatic exemption from creditor process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (66-Y 27-N) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5068ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (83-Y 14-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (83-Y 14-N)
2020-10-13 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Surovell, Petersen, Chafin
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Ayala, Sullivan, Adams, L.R.
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (34-Y 2-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Rejected (66-Y 27-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (66-Y 27-N) (Requires 78 affirmative votes to pass)
2020-10-01SenateFloor substitute printed 20201273D-S2 (Petersen)
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate- floor substitute HB5068S2
2020-10-01SenateSubstitute by Senator Petersen agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute rejected
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 2-A)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201176D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: (82-Y 16-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (82-Y 16-N)
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5068H1
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201042D-H1
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201042D-H1
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-08-18HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 20200825D
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200825D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801512.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5068&202+sum+HB5068
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5068+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5068H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5068S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5068S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5068ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0013+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0046+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0076+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0044+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5068+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0186HB5068+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0118+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0237HB5068+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0279HB5068+HB5068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0189+HB5068

Bill Comments

feedback