VA HB504 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1207)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; mature trees. Adds (i) the preservation of mature trees or planting of trees, both as a water quality protection tool and as a means of providing other natural resource benefits, and (ii) coastal resilience and adaptation to sea-level rise and climate change to the list of activities that the State Water Control Board is directed to encourage and promote as it adopts criteria for local governments to use as they consider development in Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas. The bill directs the Board to adopt regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; preservation of mature trees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 10-N) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1207)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1207 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB504ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (54-Y 41-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (54-Y 41-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-12HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB504ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 10-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N)
2020-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
2020-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 20102168D-E
2020-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB504E
2020-01-27HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-27HouseRead second time
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102168D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:72(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB504&201+sum+HB504
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB504+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB504E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB504ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB504ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1207+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0102V0002+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0030+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0108+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0099+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB0504+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0831HB0504+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2007HB0504+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2044HB0504+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2045HB0504+HB0504
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2162+HB0504

Bill Comments

feedback