VA HB5001 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)

Summary

Budget Bill. Amending Chapter 836 of the 2017 Acts of Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Newman rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Newman rejected, Chair Votes No (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments rejected (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with Senate amendments substituted for House amendments (10-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
2018-06-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 6/7/18)
2018-06-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5001ER)
2018-06-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, June 8, 2018
2018-06-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on June 1, 2018
2018-06-01SenateSigned by President
2018-06-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-06-01HouseEnrolled
2018-05-30HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (68-Y 30-N)
2018-05-30HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House (68-Y 30-N)
2018-05-30HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
2018-05-30HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 29-N)
2018-05-30HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House (69-Y 29-N)
2018-05-30SenatePassed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
2018-05-30SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Newman rejected (19-Y 21-N)
2018-05-30SenatePending question ordered (21-Y 19-N)
2018-05-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-05-30SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Newman rejected, Chair Votes No (20-Y 20-N)
2018-05-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-05-30SenateSubstitute by Senator Hanger agreed to (22-Y 18-N)
2018-05-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-05-30SenateCommittee amendments rejected (18-Y 22-N)
2018-05-30SenateFloor substitute printed 18200255D-S1 (Hanger)
2018-05-30SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-05-30SenateRead third time
2018-05-29SenateRead second time
2018-05-29SenateReported from Finance with Senate amendments substituted for House amendments (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-05-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
2018-04-17HousePassed House (67-Y 32-N)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-17HouseConstitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 30-N)
2018-04-17HouseContested committee amendment Item 3-5.20#1H agreed to (69-Y 30-N)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A)
2018-04-17HouseContested committee amendment Item C-14.50#1H agreed to (97-Y 0-N 2-A)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 31-N)
2018-04-17HouseContested committee amendment Item 310#1H agreed to (68-Y 31-N)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 32-N)
2018-04-17HouseContested committee amendment Item 306#2H agreed to (67-Y 32-N)
2018-04-17HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-17HouseUncontested committee amendments agreed to (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-17HouseRead second time
2018-04-13HouseRead first time
2018-04-13HouseBudget amendments available
2018-04-13HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 5-N)
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 04/11/18 18200006D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+sum+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+H02V0001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1592+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1593+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1594+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1595+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1596+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1597+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1598+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+S05V0005+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0016HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0017HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0018HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0019HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0020HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+SV0021HB5001+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1702+HB5001
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?182+vot+HV1704+HB5001

Bill Comments

feedback