VA HB50 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Penalty for DUI maiming. Provides that the punishment for DUI maiming, a Class 6 felony, shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of one year.
Title
DUI; penalty for maiming shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of one year.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-03 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB962-Bell, Robert B.) by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-12-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-16 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100689D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB50 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB50+hil |