VA HB5 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Town of Leesburg Parking Authority. Authorizes the creation of the Town of Leesburg Parking Authority. The bill grants to the Authority various powers, including the authority to construct, operate, and lease parking facilities, contract with outside entities, issue revenue bonds and revenue refunding bonds, and acquire property. The bill also exempts the Authority from taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town of Leesburg Parking Authority; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-01SenateSigned by President
2024-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5ER)
2024-02-27HouseEnrolled
2024-02-21SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2024-02-21SenateRead third time
2024-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-19SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
2024-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2024-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N)
2024-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (74-Y 26-N)
2024-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2024-02-05HousePassed by for the day
2024-02-02HousePassed by for the day
2024-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-29HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-26HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-24HousePassed by for the day
2024-01-23HouseRead first time
2024-01-19HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
2024-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-16HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-11-27HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-11-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100204D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback