VA HB5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation and expenses of electoral board members and general registrars. Provides for reimbursement by the Commonwealth to the localities of the full cost of compensation and expenses of electoral board members and general registrars.
Title
Electoral board members and general registrars; reimbursement to localities for cost of expenses.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100542D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB5 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB5+hil |