VA HB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Tourism Authority; marketing model for casinos. Directs the Executive Director of the Virginia Tourism Authority to develop a state and local tourist marketing model for casinos in the Commonwealth that shall include (i) identification of the Authority's specific and measurable marketing goals and the timetable to achieve such goals, (ii) identification of specific marketing activities, and (iii) the development of quantifiable metrics and performance measures for attaining each such goal. The bill also requires the Authority to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on its marketing model and its progress toward meeting the goals and objectives stated in the marketing model. The provisions of the bill shall not become effective unless and until legislation legalizing casino gaming in the Commonwealth is passed by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly and becomes law.
Title
Virginia Tourism Authority; marketing model for casinos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (13-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101452D |
Same As/Similar To
HB496 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote