VA HB491 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/12)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/12)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Receivership of derelict and blighted buildings. Authorizes a locality to serve as a receiver, appointed by the circuit court, to repair blighted and derelict buildings. Buildings must previously have been determined to be blighted under current spot blight provisions. The owner of the property may redeem the property subject to receivership during the receivership process or prior to sale and will be awarded any profits gained through sale at public auction.
Title
Derelict and blighted buildings; authorizes locality to serve as receiver to repair.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Daniel Marshall [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB491ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB491ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-20 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103223D |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Same As) 2012-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)