VA HB49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB49
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility of Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility of educational placement transition of certain students with disabilities. Requires the Department of Education and relevant local school boards to develop and implement a pilot program for the transition of students who are educated in private school settings pursuant to Individualized Education Programs to the appropriate public school setting in the relevant local school division for up to four years in two to eight local school divisions in the Commonwealth. In developing the pilot, the Department is required to partner with the appropriate school board employees in each such local school division to (i) identify the resources, services, and supports required by each student who resides in each such local school division and who is educated in a private school setting pursuant to his Individualized Education Program; (ii) study the feasibility of transitioning each such student from his private school setting to an appropriate public school setting in the local school division and providing the identified resources, services, and supports in such public school setting; and (iii) recommend a process for redirecting federal, state, and local funds, including funds provided pursuant to the Children's Services Act, provided for the education of each such student to the local school division for the purpose of providing the identified resources, services, and supports in the appropriate public school setting. The bill requires the Department of Education to make a report to the Governor, the Senate Committees on Education and Health and Finance, and the House Committees on Education and
Title
Students with disabilities, certain; feasibility of educational placement transition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101219D |
Same As/Similar To
HB49 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote