VA HB49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans; sale by authorized foreign health insurers. Establishes a procedure by which the State Corporation Commission may authorize health insurers licensed to sell health benefit plans in any other state to sell health benefit plans in Virginia without obtaining a license to engage in the business of insurance in Virginia or complying with other requirements applicable to Virginia-licensed insurers. A health benefit plan sold by an authorized foreign health insurer is not be required to include state-mandated health benefits. The measure establishes criteria to be used by the Commission in determining whether to authorize a foreign health insurer to sell, offer, or provide a health benefit plan in the Commonwealth. The measure authorizes the Commission to conduct market conduct and financial condition examinations of any foreign health insurer that has applied for, or has received, authorization to sell health benefit plans in Virginia. The measure also specifies disclosures that an authorized foreign health insurer is required to include in applications and policies. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019.
Title
Health benefit plans; sale by authorized foreign health insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100944D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |