VA HB482 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Witness testimony accompanied by certified facility dogs. Provides that in any criminal proceeding the attorney for the Commonwealth or the defendant may request and the court may enter an order authorizing the use of a certified facility dog to aid a testifying witness, provided that the use of a certified facility dog will aid the witness in providing testimony and the presence and use of the certified facility dog will not interfere with or distract from the testimony or proceedings. The bill provides that the court may make any orders necessary to preserve the fairness of the proceeding, including imposing restrictions on and instructing the jury regarding the presence of the certified facility dog. The bill defines "certified facility dog" as a dog that (i) has completed training and been certified by a program accredited by Assistance Dogs International or another organization whose main purpose is to improve training, placement, and utilization of assistance dogs and (ii) is accompanied by a duly trained handler. This bill is identical to SB 420.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Witness testimony; accompanied by certified facility dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB482ER)
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB482ER)
2018-03-10HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
2018-03-06 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-02-27HouseDelegates: Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring
2018-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-26SenateSenators: McDougle, Stuart, Howell
2018-02-26SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2018-02-20HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107096D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2018-02-19HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-16HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
2018-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB482S1
2018-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107096D-S1
2018-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-14SenateRead third time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107096D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB482H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105729D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105729D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104420D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18267.9:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB482
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB482+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB482H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB482S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB482ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0524+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0043+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0037+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0241+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0302+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0479HB0482+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0884+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0514HB0482+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0602HB0482+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0996HB0482+HB0482
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1480+HB0482

Bill Comments

feedback