VA HB473 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; jumbo bingo. Authorizes the conduct of a new charitable game known as jumbo bingo. The bill sets out the terms and conditions under which jumbo bingo may be conducted, provides for the licensing of jumbo bingo network providers, and sets the maximum prize amount for jumbo bingo. The bill defines the terms "jumbo bingo," "pari-mutuel play," and "jumbo bingo network provider," and contains technical amendments. The bill also raises the instant bingo prize amount from $599 to $1,000.
Title
Charitable gaming; authorizes jumbo bingo.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2012-02-03 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103404D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.34:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3732.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB473 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB473+hil |