VA HB471 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

State and local tax and regulatory exemptions for new small businesses. Exempts new small businesses from (i) payment of unemployment, sales and use, and local license taxes and (ii) certain registration and reporting requirements with the State Corporation Commission. The bill defines an eligible business as any business that has its principal place of business in the Commonwealth, has not been in existence for more than five years, and has fewer than six employees or has paid less than $5,000 for the purchase or lease of business personal property, including machinery and tools and merchants' capital, since its inception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small businesses, new; state and local tax and regulatory exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Finance
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-01HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-30HouseReferred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Finance
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments by voice vote
2018-01-17HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12119.2(n/a)See Bill Text
1311011(n/a)See Bill Text
1311015(n/a)See Bill Text
131619(n/a)See Bill Text
131634(n/a)See Bill Text
5813703(n/a)See Bill Text
581609.3(n/a)See Bill Text
602212.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback