VA HB47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Payday Lending Prohibition Act; penalties. Prohibits any person from engaging in any business that consists in whole or in part of making, offering, arranging, or acting as an agent in the making of loans on the security of (i) a check or other draft drawn on the account of an individual at a bank, savings institution, or credit union; (ii) any form of assignment of an interest in the account of an individual at a bank, savings institution, or credit union; or (iii) any form of assignment of income payable to an individual, other than loans based on income tax refunds. The prohibition does not apply to certain lenders subject to the general supervision of or subject to examination by the State Corporation Commission or to banks, savings institutions, or credit unions operating under the laws of the United States or any state. A violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor. Violators are also subject to civil penalties, cease and desist orders, and private actions. Violations are a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Existing provisions providing for the licensing and regulation of payday lenders are repealed.
Title
Payday Lending Prohibition Act; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100853D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1829 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1838 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |