VA HB47 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mixed-Delivery Preschool Fund and Grant Program established. Establishes the Mixed-Delivery Preschool Fund and Grant Program for the purpose of awarding grants on a competitive basis to urban, suburban, and rural community applicants to field-test innovative strategies and evidence-based practices that support a robust system of mixed-delivery preschool services in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Virginia Early Childhood Foundation (the Foundation) to administer a request for proposal process to invite community applicants to respond with localized innovations and approaches to a mixed-delivery preschool services system. Grants are awarded by the Foundation and priority is given to applicants who (i) commit to pursuing models of local governance that promote the successful mixed delivery of preschool services, (ii) compare classroom and child outcomes among teachers with different credentials and qualifications, (iii) utilize incentives to encourage participation, and (iv) utilize strategic assessment to discern outcomes. The bill requires the award of six two-year grants during each year of the 2016-2018 biennium. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Mixed-Delivery Preschool Fund and Grant Program; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 89 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 89 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB47ER2) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 11-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB47ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 12-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105940D-S1 (83-Y 12-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB47S1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105940D-S1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105940D-S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2015-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100919D |