VA HB467 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited standing to seek injunctive relief against manufacturing companies. Provides that no action shall be initiated or maintained to enjoin the continued use and operation of a previously existing manufacturing company solely on the basis of a claimant's use of a public park, recreational facility, or playground or public greenway. The bill does not limit actions brought by the Commonwealth, a locality, or another entity designated by the locality to have authority over the operation of a public park, recreational facility, or playground.
Title
Manufacturing companies; limited standing to seek injunctive relief against companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB467ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB467H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105024D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105024D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103255D |