VA HB464 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Virginia Beach. Provides that a Virginia Beach city council member from one of the residence districts who decides to run for an at-large seat on the council shall tender his resignation as a council member not less than 10 days prior to the date for the filing of petitions. Similarly, a city council member from one of the at-large seats who decides to run for a residence district seat on the council shall tender his resignation as a council member not less than 10 days prior to the filing date. The unexpired portion of the term of any such council member who has resigned shall be filled at the same general election, or by special election if the seat is to be filled by special election.
Title
Virginia Beach, City of; amending charter, council members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB464ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101693D |
Same As/Similar To
SB900 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)