VA HB46 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; in-state tuition; certain residents of United States territories. Declares eligible for in-state tuition at public institutions of higher education until July 1, 2022, any resident of a United States territory for which a major disaster has been declared by the President of the United States in 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tuition, in-state; certain residents of United States territories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2017-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100641D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback