VA HB46 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Education; establishment of School Readiness Committee. Directs the Secretary of Education to establish a School Readiness Committee with the first goal of addressing the development and alignment of an effective professional development and credentialing system for the early childhood education workforce in the Commonwealth, including the (i) development of a competency-based professional development pathway for practitioners who teach children birth to age five in both public and private early childhood education programs; (ii) consideration of articulation agreements between associate and baccalaureate degree programs; (iii) refinement of teacher licensure and education programs to address competencies specific to early childhood development; (iv) alignment of existing professional development funding streams; and (v) development of innovative approaches to increasing accessibility, availability, affordability, and accountability of the Commonwealth's workforce development system for early childhood education teachers and providers.
Title
School Readiness Committee; Secretary of Education, et al., shall establish, increases membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 10-N) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider insisting on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider insisting on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB46ER) |
2016-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 10-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 10-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference substitute printed 16106314D-H2 |
2016-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Lucas, Newman |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Delegates: Greason, Robinson, Tyler |
2016-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Motion to reconsider insisting on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 16105802D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB46S1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105802D-S1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105802D-S1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB46H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16103691D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16103691D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2015-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100918D |