VA HB46 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Disaster Response Fund; hazardous materials in dwellings. Creates the Virginia Defective Drywall Correction and Restoration Assistance Fund to promote the correction and restoration of residential property affected by the environmental problems attributable to defective drywall used in new construction or renovation that occurred between 2001 and 2008. The fund will be administered by the Virginia Resources Authority and the Department of Housing and Community Development. Under the bill, the Department of Housing and Community Development would develop guidelines for the distribution of loans or grants from the Fund to particular recipients. The grants and loans may be used to pay the reasonable and necessary costs associated with (i) the remediation of a contaminated property to remove hazardous substances, hazardous wastes, or solid wastes, (ii) the stabilization or restoration of such structures or (iii) the demolition and removal of the existing structures or other work necessary to remediate or reuse the real property. The bill also makes defective drywall restoration or remediation projects eligible for financing by the Authority.
Title
Virginia Defective Drywall Correction and Restoration Assistance Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Oder [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-14 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-14 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB46ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's substitute printed 10106168D-H2 | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB46ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-14 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-14 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-14 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference substitute printed 10106078D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Senators: Miller, J.C., Wagner, Northam | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-09 | House: Delegates: Oder, Sherwood, Miller, P.J. | |
2010-03-09 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-08 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 10105653D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB46S1 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105653D-S1 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105653D-S1 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102025D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB46E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-11 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2009-12-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2009-12-18 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102025D |