VA HB459 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pedestrians and drivers; responsibilities. Sets out the responsibilities of pedestrians and drivers at marked and unmarked crosswalks.
Title
Pedestrians and drivers; sets out responsibilities at marked and unmarked crosswalks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2010-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101496D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 836 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 908.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 923.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 924 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 924.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 924.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 933 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB459 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB459+hil |