VA HB456 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education: Higher Education Committee
Hearing: Feb 20 @ 8:00 am in Senate Room A, Pocahontas Bldg.
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; veterans; withdrawal; tuition refund. Requires each public institution of higher education to provide a refund of the tuition and mandatory fees paid by any veteran student for any course from which he is forced to withdraw, for the first time, due to a service-connected medical condition during a semester, as certified in writing to the institution by a physician licensed to practice medicine who treated the veteran student for such medical condition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; withdrawal of veteran student.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102187D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231607.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback