VA HB453 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Neck-Middle Peninsula Public Education Consortium; regional boundaries and governing board. Adds King George County and King William County as member counties of the Northern Neck-Middle Peninsula Public Education Consortium and updates the list of senatorial and house districts represented by the legislative advisory members of the Consortium's governing board.
Title
Northern Neck-Middle Peninsula Public Education Consortium; regional boundaries and governing board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 147 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB453ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100067D |