VA HB450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Parking of vehicles; electric vehicle charging spots; civil penalties. Prohibits a person from parking a vehicle not capable of receiving an electric charge or not in the process of charging in a space clearly marked as reserved for charging electric vehicles. A violation is subject to a civil penalty of no more than $25. Parking of vehicles; electric vehicle charging spots; civil penalties. Prohibits a person from parking a vehicle not capable of receiving an electric charge or not in the process of charging in a space clearly marked as reserved for charging electric vehicles. A violation is subject to a civil penalty of no more than $25.
Title
Parking of vehicles; electric vehicle charging spaces, signage for penalty, civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Briana Sewell [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] | Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 23-N 1-A) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB450ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 23-N 1-A) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (76-Y 23-N 1-A) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB450ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Ebbin withdrawn 22106860D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106860D-S1 (Ebbin) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (73-Y 24-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 24-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102584D-E |
2022-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB450E |
2022-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102584D |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB278 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB278 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto