VA HB45 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family life education curricula; personal privacy and personal boundaries. Requires any family life education curriculum offered in any elementary school, middle school, or high school to incorporate age-appropriate elements of effective and evidence-based programs on the importance of the personal privacy and personal boundaries of other individuals and tools for a student to use to ensure that he respects the personal privacy and personal boundaries of other individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family life education curricula; personal privacy and personal boundaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 383 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB45ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N)
2018-02-14SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HousePrinted as engrossed 18101173D-E
2018-02-08HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB45E
2018-02-08HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-08HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseReported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101173D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB45
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB45+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB45E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB45ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0383+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0902V0022+HB0045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0046+HB0045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0458+HB0045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0265+HB0045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB0045+HB0045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0705HB0045+HB0045

Bill Comments

feedback