VA HB45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly districts; technical adjustments. Makes technical changes to House of Delegates Districts 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 22, 23, 25, 26, 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 40, 42, 43, 44, 45, 50, 51, 52, 55, 57, 58, 59, 60, 64, 65, 67, 75, 76, 77, 80, 87, 93, 94, 95, 96, and 99 in order to eliminate split voting precincts and otherwise facilitate administration of legislative elections by local officials. All districts remain within one percent deviation of the ideal population.
Title
General Assembly districts; technical adjustments to certain House of Delegates districts.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14104908D-EH1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB45EH1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Toscano rejected |
2014-02-10 | House | Amendments by Delegate Sickles agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104908D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104908D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Appointments |
2013-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101173D |