VA HB449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Distrained or levied on personal property; auctioneers or auction firms outside the county or city of an officer. Allows for the use of a Virginia-licensed auctioneer or auction firm in selling distrained or levied on personal property and the transportation of such property to an auction site for such sale, regardless of whether the auction site is within or outside the county or city of the officer responsible for selling such property. Under current law, an officer who distrains or levies on personal property is not allowed to remove such property from his county or city.
Title
Personal property; distrained or levied on property, auctioneers or auction firms outside county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 62 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB449ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102318D |