VA HB443 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a concealed handgun; exception. Allows any person who regardless of having met the demonstration of competence requirement is otherwise qualified to obtain a concealed handgun permit to carry a handgun concealed in any place where such person could openly carry a handgun.
Title
Carrying a concealed handgun; permit not required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Constitutional Law |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 16103804D |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103804D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB443 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB443+hil |