VA HB44 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; injuries presumed to be in course of employment. Establishes presumptions in claims under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act that the accident arose out of and in the course of employment if the employee (i) dies with there being no evidence that he ever regained consciousness after the accident, (ii) dies at the accident location or nearby, or (iii) is found dead where he is reasonably expected to be as an employee. These presumptions will exist in the absence of a preponderance of evidence to the contrary and where the factual circumstances are of sufficient strength from which the only rational inference to be drawn is that the accident arose out of and in the course of employment.
Title
Workers' compensation; injuries or deaths presumed to be in course of employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB44ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB44H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105123D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105123D-H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Workers Comp |
2015-11-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-11-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101131D |