VA HB437 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Localities; public meeting; state project planning phase. Allows a locality the option to request a public meeting in the locality during the planning phase of a public facilities state project from the state agency or institution of higher education responsible for such project.
Title
Localities; public meeting during state project planning phase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB437ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101502D |