VA HB437 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - VOTE: DEFEATED (40-Y 58-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - VOTE: DEFEATED (40-Y 58-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Convention to amend the United States Constitution; selection and participation of Virginia delegates. Provides for the selection by the General Assembly of delegates and alternates to attend the convention, for instructions to the delegates and alternates, for their oath to adhere to the instructions, for the appointment of observers, and for the power to recall delegates, alternates, and observers.
Title
Convention to amend the United States Constitution; selection and participation of Va. delegates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 58-N) (Y: 41 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (40-Y 58-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (40-Y 58-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (9-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101834D |