VA HB435 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parole Board; powers and duties. Provides that the Virginia Parole Board (the Board) shall review and decide the case of each prisoner who is eligible for parole no later than that part of the calendar year in which he becomes eligible and (i) every three years thereafter, until he is released on parole or discharged, provided that there are 10 years or more or life imprisonment remaining on the sentence in each case, or (ii) annually thereafter, until he is released on parole or discharged if there are fewer than 10 years remaining on the sentence in each case. The bill also provides that, as a part of the investigation before the Board decides to grant or deny parole, the Board shall, if applicable, review in its entirety the transcript from the trial that resulted in the conviction or convictions for which the inmate is currently serving a term of imprisonment.
Title
Parole Board; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 22105381D-EH1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB435EH1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Amendments by Delegate Wright agreed to |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105381D-H1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105381D-H1 |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102809D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |