VA HB430 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bail; violation of conditions of release; report available to attorney for the Commonwealth and counsel of record. Requires that any report of a violation of any pretrial condition of release provided to the court shall be sent by the pretrial services agency to the attorney for the Commonwealth and the counsel of record for the accused or juvenile, or directly to the accused or juvenile if such person is not represented by counsel. Bail; violation of conditions of release; report available to attorney for the Commonwealth and counsel of record. Requires that any report of a violation of any pretrial condition of release provided to the court shall be sent by the pretrial services agency to the attorney for the Commonwealth and the counsel of record for the accused or juvenile, or directly to the accused or juvenile if such person is not represented by counsel.
Title
Bail; violation of any pretrial condition of release, report available to counsel of record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074) | |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 74 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB430ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB430H1 |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105866D-H1 |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105866D-H1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102392D |