VA HB429 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracting; limitations. Provides that the sum of all projects performed in an architectural and professional engineering contract term shall not exceed $10 million, and the fee for any single project shall not exceed $2.5 million. The bill allows a contract for multiple architectural or professional engineering projects to be renewable for up to three additional terms at the option of the public body. Current law limits the sum of all projects performed in a one-year contract term to $750,000, with up to four additional one-year terms at the option of the public body, and limits the fee for any single project to $150,000, with specific exceptions to those limits, including a limit for total projects for rail projects of $5 million and for highway projects, $8 million. The bill also removes specific agency and locality exceptions to such current limits.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB429ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB429H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105823D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Incorporates HB438 (Sewell) |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105823D-H1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100617D |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by General Laws
HB438 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by General Laws
SB225 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
SB225 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
HB438 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by General Laws
SB225 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
SB225 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Architects
Contracts
Engineers Professional
Virginia Public Procurement Act
Architects
Contracts
Engineers Professional
Virginia Public Procurement Act