VA HB427 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children's Services Act; parent representatives; community policy and management teams; family assessment and planning teams. Removes provisions that prohibit a parent representative from serving as a member of a community policy and management team (CPMT) or a family assessment and planning team (FAPT) if such parent representative is employed by a public or private program that receives funds pursuant to the law or agencies represented on a FAPT or CPMT and interacts directly on a regular and daily basis with children or supervises employees who interact directly on a regular basis with children; however, the bill directs prioritization of participation by parent representatives who are not employed by a public or private program that receives funds pursuant to the law or agencies represented on a FAPT or CPMT. The bill directs the State Executive Council for Children's Services to inventory current efforts to recruit and retain parent representatives on CPMTs and FAPTs and compile a list of best practices for including and elevating parent voices within CPMTs and FAPTs for distribution to local Children's Services Act programs. The bill requires the State Executive Council for Children's Services to provide a copy of this report to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions no later than November 1, 2022.
Title
Children's Services Act; community policy and management teams and family assessment, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB427ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107739D-H2 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Herring, Hodges, Walker |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senators: Barker, McPike, Pillion |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB427H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106327D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106327D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103267D |
Same As/Similar To
SB435 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
SB435 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
SB435 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)