VA HB427 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conversion therapy prohibited. Prohibits any health care provider or person who performs counseling as part of his training for any profession licensed by a regulatory board of the Department of Health Professions from engaging in conversion therapy with any person under 18 years of age. The bill defines "conversion therapy" as any practice or treatment that seeks to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity, including efforts to change behaviors or gender expressions or to eliminate or reduce sexual or romantic attractions or feelings toward individuals of the same gender. "Conversion therapy" does not include counseling that provides assistance to a person undergoing gender transition, or counseling that provides acceptance, support, and understanding of a person or facilitates a person's coping, social support, and identity exploration and development, including sexual-orientation-neutral interventions to prevent or address unlawful conduct or unsafe sexual practices, as long as such counseling does not seek to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill provides that no state funds shall be expended for the purpose of conducting conversion therapy, referring a person for conversion therapy, extending health benefits coverage for conversion therapy, or awarding a grant or contract to any entity that conducts conversion therapy or refers individuals for conversion therapy.
Title
Conversion therapy; prohibited, no state funds shall be expended for purpose of therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100751D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB427 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB427+hil |