VA HB424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a school resource officer in every school; School Resource Officer Supplementary Fund created. Requires each local school board to place a school resource officer in each public elementary and secondary school. The bill provides that 44 percent of revenues from taxes on alcohol licenses, distilled spirits, and beer and wine coolers shall accrue to the School Resource Officer Supplementary Fund, created by the bill, which would be used to fund the costs of the school resource officer requirement.
Title
School resource officers; required in every school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103501D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 279.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |