VA HB42 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Spousal support awards; limit duration. Creates a rebuttable presumption that no spousal support award shall exceed the length of time between the date of marriage and the date of separation, unless otherwise provided by contract or stipulation or unless the court determines otherwise.
Title
Spousal support awards; limit duration.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-11-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100670D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB42 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB42+hil |