VA HB419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adult. Increases the minimum age that a juvenile can be tried as an adult in circuit court for a felony from 14 years of age to 16 years of age. The bill would still allow juveniles 14 years of age or older to be tried as an adult for capital murder or first-degree murder.
Title
Juveniles; increases minimum age for trial as adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103623D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 285.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 299.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |